GA SB414 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to charitable solicitations, so as to allow local governing authorities to issue written notices for the failure to clean and maintain collection receptacles; to allow petition to superior court for an order for the removal of collection receptacles if the property owner or paid solicitor does not comply with violation notices for at least three occasions in one calendar year; to provide for a superior court to order collection receptacles to be removed at the cost of the paid solicitor or charitable organization; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable Solicitations; local governing authorities to issue written notices for failure to clean and maintain collection receptacles; allow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #547 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-12SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback