GA SB412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to change certain provisions relating to administrative and civil sanctions against charitable organizations, paid solicitors, and solicitor agents for certain violations; to provide for suspension and revocation of registrations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and Businesses; administrative and civil sanctions against charitable organizations, paid solicitors, and solicitor agents for certain violations; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Carden Summers [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Passage: House Vote #724 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #494 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #494 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |