GA SB407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 416
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 416
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for comprehensive reform for offenders; to amend Title 15 and Chapter 6A of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts and the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; to amend Title 17, Code Section 24-4-609, Chapter 5 of Title 40, Title 42, and Code Section 43-1-19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure, impeachment by evidence of conviction of a crime, drivers' licenses, penal institutions, and grounds for refusing to grant or revoking professional licenses; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 and Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Community Health and public assistance; to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Justice System; comprehensive reform for offenders; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #772 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #852 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #782 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #514 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #852 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #782 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #514 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Act 416 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |