GA SB406 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1A of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to early care and learning, so as to give a short title to a Code section relating to emergency closure of an early care and education program upon the death of a minor or under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Jace Hester Law'; emergency closure of an early care and education program upon death of a minor
Sponsors
Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/35786 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/sb406_As_introduced_LC_33_4465_2.htm |