GA SB398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to prohibit the assignment of graded homework for students in grades kindergarten through two; to provide for a short title; to provide for a definition; to provide for exceptions; to provide for statutory construction; provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"After School Recess Act"; assignment of graded homework for students in grades kindergarten through two; prohibit; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Nikema Williams [D] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57498 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190233 |