GA SB393 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 and Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the university system and the Georgia Bureau of Investigation, respectively, so as to revise the duties and powers of certain law enforcement officers and agencies; to expand the power of campus policemen and other security personnel of the university system to make arrests for felony offenses; to codify the Legal Division of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation; to expand the jurisdiction of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation in regards to street gang terrorism and prevention; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Officers and Agencies; duties and powers; revise; campus policemen and other security personnel of the university system; arrests for felony offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #770 (Y: 99 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #787 (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #513 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Effective Date
2020-06-29 Act 390
2020-06-29SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-26SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-02SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-19SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback