GA SB388 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from Cherokee County School District ad valorem taxes for educational purposes for the full value of the homestead for certain residents of that school district who have annual incomes not exceeding $16,000.00 and who are 62 years of age or over, approved March 10, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 3677), as amended, so as to provide for a full value exemption for senior and disabled residents; to provide for a residency requirement and grandfathering of certain residents; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cherokee County School District; full value exemption for senior and disabled residents; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #507 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #482 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #482 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Act 359 | |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-02-15 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |