GA SB388 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state printing and documents in general, so as to provide that in general when any state law authorizes or directs a state officer or agency to publish any matter, such publication may be made in printed or electronic format; to provide a preference for electronic format; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for conforming amendments to numerous specific provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated relating to publication of particular matters so as to authorize print or electronic publication; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Printing; any state law authorizes a state officer/agency to publish any matter such publication made in printed and electronic format
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Dan Moody [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #943 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #549 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #549 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 615 | |
2010-06-03 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Postponed | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred |