GA SB386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 33 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Special Needs Scholarship Act, so as to revise the prior school year requirement; to expand eligibility for students; to revise the basis for calculating scholarship amounts; to require annual parent surveys and a complaint procedure for scholarship calculations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Special Needs Scholarship Act; prior school year requirement; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #563 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-19SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-18SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback