GA SB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to prohibit the location of any municipal solid waste disposal facility or any coal combustion residual landfill within a certain distance of a blackwater river wholly contained within the borders of this state and originating on the coastal plain, and which flows directly into the ocean; to amend Part 3 of Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal trespass and damage to property relative to waste control; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to county special purpose local option sales tax, so as to provide for conforming cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Management; location of any municipal solid waste disposal facility within certain distance of a blackwater river; flows directly into the ocean; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #630 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-12SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-03-12SenateSenate Tabled
2020-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-19SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-18SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback