GA SB382 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 357
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-30-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to optometrists, so as to provide for guidance and consultation by the Department of Public Health on certain training programs approved by the State Board of Optometry for doctors of optometry who administer pharmaceutical agents by injection; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometrists guidance and consultation by the Department of Public Health; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #696 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #551 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 357
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback