GA SB377 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Act 382
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Act 382
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 15 and 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the courts and social services, respectively, so as to provide for the licensing of qualified residential treatment programs; to revise the definition of "qualified residential treatment program" to conform with federal law; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts and Social Services; licensing of qualified residential treatment programs; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #666 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #457 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #457 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Act 382 | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |