GA SB374 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Data Analytic Center, so as to provide for definitions; to establish the Georgia Data Analytic Center as an agent of all executive state agencies; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Data Analytic Center; establish as an agent of all executive state agencies; definitions; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #821 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #519 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #519 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2022-04-04 | House | House Insisted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |