GA SB373 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a multimember board of commissioners of Haralson County, approved August 24, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, Ex. Sess., p. 247), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4648), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office for the current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Haralson County; election of members of the board of commissioners; revise the districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #463 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #463 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 402 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |