GA SB369 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conservation and natural resources, so as to provide for an extension of the automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources; provide for an extension of the automatic repeal of Code Section 12-5-9
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #482 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |