GA SB366 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4A of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Juvenile Justice, so as to revise restrictions regarding possession of contraband at juvenile detention centers; to amend Code Section 16-15-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions in the 'Georgia Street Gang Terrorism and Prevention Act,' so as to provide for a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Justice Dept.; revise restrictions; possessions of contraband at juvenile detention centers
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] |
Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #873 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #803 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #716 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #477 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #803 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #716 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #477 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-07 | Act 771 | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |