GA SB363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 10 of Article 8 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous liens, so as to create a contractor's cause of action for unpaid work; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Miscellaneous Liens; create a contractor's cause of action for unpaid work
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #526 (Y: 26 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #527 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #527 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |