GA SB360 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of hospitals and related institutions, so as to prohibit certain conduct relating to physicians; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hospitals; prohibit certain conduct relating to physicians; provide definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Mike Crane [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |