GA SB357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to revise the ability of persons to carry weapons in places of worship and in schools operated by such places of worship; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; carry weapons in places of worship and in schools operated by such places of worship; revise the ability
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57148 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189296 |