GA SB356 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of superior court judges for each judicial circuit, so as to provide for an additional judge of the Bell-Forsyth Judicial Circuit; to provide for the initial appointment of such judge by the Governor; to provide for the election and term of office of such judge; to provide for additional court reporters and personnel and the compensation of such reporters and personnel; to declare inherent authority; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior Courts; provide additional judge of the Bell-Forsyth Judicial Circuit; initial appointment; election and term of office
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #851 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #751 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #577 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #751 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #577 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 597 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Read and Referred |