GA SB35 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate honoring Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc.; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special License Plates; specialty license plate honoring Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #396 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #294 (Y: 137 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #194 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #294 (Y: 137 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #194 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |