GA SB345 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to corporations organized for religious, fraternal, or educational purposes, so as to provide for the policy of the state with regard to determining the property rights of religious organizations; to provide that such disputes shall be resolved by a neutral principles analysis of all relevant matters; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Corporations, Partnership, and Associations; provide for the policy of state determining property rights of religious organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. JaNice VanNess [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #525 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |