GA SB341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 46 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the prior authorizations of healthcare services, so as to provide guidelines for the prior authorization of a prescribed medication for chronic conditions requiring ongoing medication therapy under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Healthcare Services; guidelines for the prior authorization of a prescribed medication for chronic conditions requiring ongoing medication therapy; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #764 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #512 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #512 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-05-06 | Act 830 | |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |