GA SB324 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 18 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state printing and documents, so as to provide for a victim centered address confidentiality program; to provide for application to such program; to provide for designation of confidential addresses; to provide for certification of program participants; to provide for renewal and cancellation of certifications; to provide for disclosures; to provide for real property records; to provide for training; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Printing and Documents; a victim centered address confidentiality program; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Jackson [D] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #787 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #758 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #564 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #758 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #564 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 582 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |