GA SB323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide patient protection measures for patients undergoing sedation in certain settings; to provide for patients under conscious sedation in dental settings and for dental procedures; to provide for patients under varying levels of sedation in physician offices and medispas; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for enforcement; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and Businesses; patient protection measures; undergoing sedation in certain settings; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #527 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |