GA SB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physicians, assistants, and others, so as to revise provisions relating to the number of physician assistants and advanced practice registered nurses a physician can authorize and supervise at any one time; to remove a limitation on where a physician assistant is authorized to practice; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Physicians, Assistants; relating to the number a physician can authorize and supervise at any one time; provisions; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #757 (Y: 137 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #780 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #579 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #780 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #579 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-04 | Act 563 | |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |