GA SB321 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 49-4-168.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to civil penalties for false or fraudulent Medicaid claims, so as to increase the civil penalties that shall be imposed in order to allow this state to recover the maximum penalty authorized by federal law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medicaid Claims; false or fraudulent; recover the maximum penalty authorized by federal law; increase the civil penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #788 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #712 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #410 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #712 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #410 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 352 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |