GA SB317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county police, so as to provide a method for the abolition of a county police department and returning the law enforcement functions of such department to the sheriff of the county; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County Police; method for the abolition of a county police department and returning the law enforcement functions of such department to the sheriff of county; provide
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |