GA SB304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Peach County Public Facilities Authority; to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide for purpose and scope of operations of the authority; to provide for definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for moneys received and trust funds; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemption, rates, charges, and revenues; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for construction of act and severability; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peach County Public Facilities Authority; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #350 (Y: 134 N: 16 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 132 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |