GA SB302 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Higher Education Facilities Authority, so as to increase the amount of bonding authority; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Higher Education Facilities Authority; increase the amount of bonding authority
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #764 - Passage (Y: 146 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 732 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-11 | Senate Read and Referred |