GA SB298 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-74.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special vehicle decals for persons with disabilities, so as to provide for the submission of a doctor's prescription with an application for a special parking decal for persons with disabilities in lieu of an affidavit when a notary public is not available; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
License Plates; submission of a doctor's prescription; application for a special parking decal for persons with disabilities in lieu of an affidavit; notary public not available
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #771 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #825 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #423 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #825 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #423 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 624 | |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |