GA SB291 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Forsyth, approved May 5, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3542), so as to revise provisions related to the powers of the city manager related to appointment of department heads; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Forsyth; provisions related to the powers of the city manager related to appointment of department heads; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #367 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #208 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #208 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 130 | |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |