GA SB289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to remove the requirement that mobile homes procure permits and procure and display decals; to repeal Code Section 48-5-492, relating to issuance of mobile home location permits and issuance and display of decals; to repeal related penalties; to revise the time for payment of related ad valorem taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad Valorem Taxation of Property; mobile homes procure permits and procure and display decals; remove the requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #765 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-25HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-23HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-02-05SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-03SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-01-31SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-01-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback