GA SB287 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to provide that, when a person reports that his or her instructional permit or driver's license has been stolen or forged, the department shall issue a replacement permit or license with a new number; to provide that the number of the stolen or forged license shall be either removed from the data base of valid permits and licenses or the number in the data base shall be marked as having been reported stolen or forged and no longer valid; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' License; instructional permit reported stolen or forged; department shall issue a replacement permit with a new number
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #490 - Passage As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-08 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Read and Referred |