GA SB283 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to accounting for public funds, so as to provide for multibank pooling of depositories for the acceptance of deposits of public funds from public bodies; to provide for definitions, procedures, conditions, and limitations on the establishment of such pools; to provide for multiple effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Accounting for Public Funds; provide multibank pooling of depositories for acceptance of deposits of public funds from public bodies
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House Vote #718 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #440 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #440 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 373 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |