GA SB274 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the restructuring of the governments of the City of Macon, the City of Payne City, and Bibb County; to create and incorporate a new political body corporate under the name Macon-Bibb County; to provide for the status, boundaries, and powers of the restructured government; to provide for the form, administration, and affairs of the restructured government; to provide for officers and employees, elections, courts, authorities, taxation, and finance; to provide for related matters; to provide for severability; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon, City of; City of Payne City; Bibb County; provide for the restructuring of the governments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #246 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-04-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-12 | House Second Readers | |
2011-04-11 | House First Readers | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred |