GA SB273 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2A of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Public Health, so as to require the Department of Public Health to establish the Maternal Mortality Review Committee to review maternal deaths; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for data; to provide for confidentiality; to provide for limited liability; to provide for reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Health, Dept. of; required to establish the Maternal Mortality Review Committee to review maternal deaths
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House Vote #711 (Y: 162 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-16 | Act 540 | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |