GA SB272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a chief judge of the Recorder's Court of Chatham County, approved March 31, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5156), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 1998 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 3557), so as to revise the method of selection of the chief judge; to provide for a court administrator; to provide for court administrator responsibilities; to require a bond; to provide for personnel policies and procedures of employees of the court; to provide for the selection and approval of the judges pro tempore of the court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Recorder's Court of Chatham County; method of selection of the chief judge; revise; court administrator; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51265 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/167794 |