GA SB27 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-6-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the enumeration of unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices and penalty, so as to prohibit a health care insurer from requiring an ophthalmologist or optometrist to extend any discounts on services that are not covered eye care services in order to receive increased payments, better reimbursements, preferential treatment, or any other benefit; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Unfair Trade Practices; health care insurer from requiring an ophthalmologist or optometrist to extend any discounts on services that are not covered eye care services; prohibit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #232 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #44 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #44 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Act 234 | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |