GA SB262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to revise the corporate boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stockbridge, City of; corporate boundaries of the city; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #675 (Y: 95 N: 58 NV: 18 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #463 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #464 (Y: 23 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #465 (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #466 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #463 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #464 (Y: 23 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #465 (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #466 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 559 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |