GA SB258 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-311 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to creation of county boards of equalization, duties, review of assessments, and appeals, so as to provide that the assessed value of property for a taxable year shall not be increased beyond the initial assessment value established by the board of tax assessors during an appeal of such valuation for such taxable year by the taxpayer but may be reduced as a result of the appeal of the taxpayer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax; provide the assessed value of property shall not be increased beyond the initial assessment value
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Vote #906 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #801 (Y: 153 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #492 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #801 (Y: 153 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #492 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 345 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 26th, 171st, 116th |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 4th, 11th |
2016-03-24 | House | House Insisted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |