GA SB258 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination - Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination - Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Snellville, approved April 28, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4566), as amended, so as to change provisions relating to voting powers of the mayor; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Snellville, City of; voting powers of the mayor; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #218 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-18 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred |