GA SB257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to animals, so as to provide for consultation with a veterinarian employed or approved by the Department of Agriculture prior to the filing of criminal charges for cruelty to animals in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Animals; consultation with a veterinarian; filing of criminal charges for cruelty to animals in certain instances; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #413 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |