GA SB257 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the Town of Trion, approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5099), so as to provide for the continuation and support of the independent school system of the town; to provide limitations on the holding of other offices by the school superintendent and members of the board of education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trion, Town of; provide for continuation/support of independent school system of the town
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #403 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 233 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |