GA SB246 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Public School Employees Retirement System, so as to provide for an increase in the employee contribution; to provide for an increase in the retirement benefit; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement; provide an increase in the employee contribution; retirement benefit; conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #831 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #778 - Passage (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #778 - Passage (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-03 | Act 763 | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred |