GA SB239 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide that tuition and mandatory student fees for students enrolled in a unit of the University System of Georgia or the Technical College System of Georgia shall be calculated and assessed on a per credit hour basis, subject to certain conditions; to provide for caps on assessed tuition and mandatory student fees based on the number of credit hours students are enrolled; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; tuition and mandatory student fees for students enrolled in a unit of the University System of Georgia; calculated and assessed on a per credit hour basis; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Kim Jackson [D] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |