GA SB239 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the operation of an unregistered vehicle or vehicle without current license plate, revalidation decal, or county decal, so as to provide for a presumption of residency under certain circumstances for drivers of vehicles displaying an out-of-state license plate; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
License Plates; unregistered vehicle; presumption of residency under certain circumstances; displaying out-of-state license plate
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred |