GA SB237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-393.4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prohibited pricing practices during a state of emergency, so as to prohibit certain pricing practices during an abnormal market disruption significantly affecting the production, distribution, supply, sale, or availability of oil, gasoline, or other petroleum products; to define terms; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce/Trade; prohibit pricing practices during an abnormal market disruption; petroleum products; define terms
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #878 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 402 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-08 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred |