GA SB234 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-23-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limited licenses, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of provisions regarding the issuance and regulation of limited licenses to sell travel insurance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; limited licenses to sell travel insurance; comprehensive revision of provision; issuance and regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. Tim Golden [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #342 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 230 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |