GA SB223 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of the Board of Commissioners of Schley County, approved February 5, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2229), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 8, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3817), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for submission of this Act for approval under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Schley County; change the description of commissioner districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 45 | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |